judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SOUTHWEST MEDICAL VS. MARQUEZ

Case Information: 36268
Short Caption:SOUTHWEST MEDICAL VS. MARQUEZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A352612Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/07/2000 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/12/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Earley Savage--check no. 16509.
06/12/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-09930
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 00-10164
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. 00-10185
06/20/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/07/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel.
08/24/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-14920
08/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-15068
09/14/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on August 28, 2000, and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. fn1[Appellants' motion for return of the $250 cost bond is denied. Appellants may seek to recover the cost bond in district court.] NNP/CLK 00-16172
09/14/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.