judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAWSON A. REECE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-248)
Case Number:06-248Case Docketed On:10/25/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Niobrara CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DAWSON A. REECE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DAWSON A. REECE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDawson A. ReeceD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/25/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/12/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/25/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/29/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/02/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with faxed copy of waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
03/06/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal - originalNotice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal
03/06/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntaryOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
03/06/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal