judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBIN HOEY V. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-0963
Short Caption:ROBIN HOEY V. OFFICE OF EMPLOYEE APPEALS, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAP5322-08Filed Date:07/28/2010

Opening Event Date:07/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/25/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/24/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/14/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobin Hoey N
Joseph Michael Hannon, Jr.YY
AppelleeDistrict of Columbia Office of Employee AppealsN
Sheila G. BarfieldNY
AppelleeD.C. Metropolitan Police DepartmentN
Todd S. KimNY
Holly M. JohnsonYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 28, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
08/25/2010RECORD INDEX
08/25/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (agency record vol. 1-3)
08/25/2010RECORD COMPLETED
08/26/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
09/30/2010 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk shall schedule this appeal for the SAME CALENDAR DATE AS APPEAL NO. 09-CV-1493, BURTON V. OEA (FITHNW) (cb)
10/01/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 60 days. no oppo *(partial consent) elp
10/15/2010 On consideration of appellant's partially consent motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before December 6, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/03/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 14 days (no oppo).
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before December 20, 2010. (JAC) elp
12/20/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
12/20/2010APPENDIX
01/24/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (Metroplitan Police Department)
01/24/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
02/07/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the appendix were filed with this court on December 20, 2011,and it further appearing that the the brief of appellee Office of Employee Appeals was due to be filed on or before January 24, 2011,(See D.C. App. R. 31),but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee Office of Employee Appeals shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief, or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on the appellate briefs on file. (JAC) elp
02/14/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo to 3/1/11
02/17/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and apellant's reply brief shall be filed on or before March 1, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/01/2011APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo to 4/15/11 (*D.C. holiday) (elp)
03/04/2011 On consideration of appellant's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the reply brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and the reply brief of appellant shall be filed with this court on or before April 18, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/30/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE Charles L. Fonville on behalf of aplt
04/04/2011TMC - motion to intervene - oppo (-) - motion to late file reply brief (-)
04/08/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION- (mpd) to Cahrles Fonville'smotion to intervene
04/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF no oppo
04/21/2011RECEIVED - aplt's reply brief
05/11/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION OF CHARLES FONVILLE TO INTERVENE IS DENIED. It is ****MORE*****
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION TO FILE THE LODGED REPLY IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file the lodged reply brief. It is ****MORE*****
05/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that THIS APPEAL SHALL BE SCHEDULED BEFORE THE SAME MERITS PANEL AS BURTON V. D.C. OEA, APPEAL 09-CV-1493. (RZTHPR)
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF
06/17/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
07/21/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
07/27/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/16/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellant)
09/29/2011FiledArgued before Chief Judge Washington, Judges Glickman, Fisher
11/03/2011FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Washington, Chief Judge, and Glickman and Fisher, Associate Judges.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of Office of Employee Appeals is affirmed.)
11/16/2011FiledMotion to extend time to file petiton for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellant)
11/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to file appellant's pet for reh/reh en banc on or before November 28, 2011.
11/28/2011FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
02/02/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's petition for reh en banc
02/14/2012FiledMandate