judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LETEBIRHAN G. KELEKROISTOS V. RESIDENCE MARRIOTT

Case Information: 10-AA-0986
Short Caption:LETEBIRHAN G. KELEKROISTOS V. RESIDENCE MARRIOTTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Employment Services
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DOES01407-10Filed Date:08/16/2010

Opening Event Date:08/16/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/12/2011
Argued/Submitted:12/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerLetebirhan G. Kelekroistos YPro SeN
RespondentResidence Marriott NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/16/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW (nunc pro tunc)
08/16/2010PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS
08/27/2010ORDER GRANT PTNR MO TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, and the Clerk shall file the lodged petition for review nunc pro tunc to August 16, 2010. F/ORDERED that Office of Administrative Hearings shall file the record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). FURTHER ORDERED that respondent shall within 30 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). (ETW)
09/22/2010NOTICE RECEIVED from Petitioner that she will be out of the country from October 8, 2010 through January 20, 2011 due to her parent's illness.
10/04/2010 On consideration of this court's order of August 27, 2010, directing respondent to identify its counsel within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that respondent shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300, 304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 15 (a)(5). Failure to comply with this order shall result in respondent being prohibited from filing its brief. (JAC)
01/04/2011RECORD ON APPEAL w/hearing of 7/13/10
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the limited appendix, including documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/10/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX
04/12/2011 On consideration of this court's order of October 4, 2010, which directed respondent to identify its counsel, and it appearing that respondent has failed to comply with the order, and it further appearing that respondent's brief was due to be filed on or before March 22, 2011, and the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that this petition for review shall be scheduled for consideration on the record and on the petitioner's brief alone. (ETW)
04/12/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/03/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
12/13/2011FiledSubmitted To Fisher,Thompson,Farrell
02/07/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/02/2012FiledMandate