judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TONY E. LARA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-76)
Case Number:06-76Case Docketed On:04/06/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:TONY E. LARA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TONY E. LARA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTony E. Lara Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/06/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/06/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/15/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Change of address. Noted address change for appellant.Notice-IncomingChange of addressFinal
07/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/05/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/08/2006Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
08/08/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal