judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Oscar Mata-Guevara v. The State of Texas

Case: 04-12-00436-CR
04-12-00436-CR
07/20/2012
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Oscar Mata-Guevara
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
04/15/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/11/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/19/2016Fee paid
03/18/2014Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk
03/11/2014Mandate issued
03/11/2014Notice received
02/12/2014Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
12/06/2013Case forwarded to higher court
11/15/2013Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
10/09/2013Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsGrant motion
08/30/2013Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/09/2013Submitted
05/24/2013Set for submission on briefs
04/16/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
04/16/2013Order entered
04/16/2013Case ready to be set
04/15/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/15/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/21/2013Fee paid
03/12/2013Letter issued by the court
03/11/2013Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/21/2013Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
01/29/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
01/29/2013Order entered
01/24/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/28/2012Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
12/18/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
12/18/2012Order entered
12/13/2012Letter filed
12/10/2012Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/08/2012Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
11/05/2012Reporters record filed
10/09/2012Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/09/2012Order entered
10/04/2012Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/28/2012Prescreened
09/12/2012Extension of time to file reporters record disposedFiling is Noted by Court
09/11/2012Extension of time to file reporters record filed
09/05/2012Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
08/22/2012Electronic Clerks Record Filed
08/03/2012Docketing statement filed
07/20/2012Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
07/19/2012Docketing statement filed
07/19/2012Notice of appeal filed in trial court
07/06/2012Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/11/2014Case StoredCase stored
03/11/2014Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mata-Guevara, OscarCriminal - AppellantMario A. Trevino
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasCrystal D. Chandler
Trial Court Information
379th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ron Rangel
2010CR7347
60 YEARS & $2,000 FINE.