judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TIMOTHY EDDINGS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1015
Short Caption:TIMOTHY EDDINGS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD12381-05Filed Date:08/10/2010

Opening Event Date:08/10/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/24/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTimothy Eddings Y
Julian S. GreenspunNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/08/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Julian Greenspun, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (dfe) For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk.
09/08/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Julian Greenspun, Esquire
09/24/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (41pgs/Tape) 4/22/08 proc.
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
12/03/2010COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS) Granted
12/08/2010 ORDERED that the APPELLANT shall, NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 29, 2010, file any response showing, with specificity, any reason why counsel's motion should not be granted and the coviction order or judgment on appeal affirmed... It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of court-appointed counsel to withdraw is HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending appellant's response to this order. (BY: ETW)
12/08/2010TMC - motion to withdraw (ANDERS)
02/02/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO WITHDRAW IS GRANTED. See Anders v. California...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
02/02/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the order on appeal in this case be and hereby IS AFFIRMED. (BRTEFA) (rf) *******AMENDED JUDGMENT ENTERED 2/3/11********* ONLY AS TO DCCA LETTERHEAD lw
02/24/2011MANDATE ISSUED