judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL MITCH OROSCO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-92)
Case Number:06-92Case Docketed On:04/28/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MICHAEL MITCH OROSCO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL MITCH OROSCO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Mitch OroscoKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/28/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/28/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/28/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/14/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/15/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/28/2006Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
06/29/2006Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/29/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal