judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRAH'S LAUGHLIN VS. FORD

Case Information: 34790
Short Caption:HARRAH'S LAUGHLIN VS. FORDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34649
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A375821Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cohen firm-check no. 3361.
09/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08467
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/28/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09269
09/28/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 21, 1999 and June 22 through June 24, 1999. To Court Reporter: Sherrie Robinson. 99-09270
10/04/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 99-09493
12/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-13208
01/21/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Court Reporter Sherrie Robinson: 30 days to file the transcript. Appellant: 100 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-00974
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 00-01026
01/24/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NNP/CLK 00-01044
01/24/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.