judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Tasha Leana Lomoglio v. The State of Texas

Case: 05-18-01091-CR
05-18-01091-CR
09/19/2018
Continuous Sexual Abuse of Young Child or Children
Tasha Leana Lomoglio
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
09/26/2019Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
09/24/2019Brief received - oral argument not requestedState
06/14/2019Amended brief filedAppellant
06/06/2019Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellant
03/29/2019Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
03/10/2020Mandate issued
12/30/2019Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
12/30/2019Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/04/2019Submitted
10/23/2019Set for submission on oral argument
09/26/2019Case ready to be set
09/26/2019Brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/26/2019Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
09/24/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/24/2019Brief received - oral argument not requested
08/13/2019Case ready to be set
08/13/2019State brief due
07/14/2019State brief due
07/12/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/11/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/20/2019Amended brief due
06/15/2019Hearing record due
06/14/2019Amended brief filed
06/10/2019Order enteredStrike
06/10/2019Case reinstated
06/06/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/06/2019Brief received - oral argument not requested
05/16/2019Order issuedAbated
03/29/2019Brief was not filed
03/27/2019Appellants brief due
03/05/2019Sealed reporters record filed
02/26/2019Corrected document requested
02/25/2019Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
02/18/2019Reporters record due
02/04/2019Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
11/20/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case
11/16/2018Record due
11/14/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed
11/14/2018Corrected document requested
09/19/2018Document filed
09/19/2018Docketing statement due
09/19/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
09/17/2018Trial court certification filed
09/17/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court
09/17/2018Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/10/2020Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lomoglio, Tasha LeanaCriminal - AppellantStephanie Hudson  
Erik Gierczyk
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasGreg A. Willis
Amy Sue Melo Murphy
John R. Rolater Jr.
Trial Court Information
380th Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Benjamin N. Smith
380-82533-2016
Karla Kimbrell
27 years in TDCJ