judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV. VS. COOPER

Case Information: 43998
Short Caption:EMPLOYERS INS. CO. OF NEV. VS. COOPERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A476115Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/06/2004 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/18/2006How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Beckett & Yott, Ltd.--check no. 1096.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17813
10/06/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/08/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 04-18728
10/22/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 04-19587
12/16/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 04-22971
01/03/2005Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 05-00055
01/20/2005Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 05-01299
02/18/2005BriefFiled Opening Brief. 05-03393
02/18/2005AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. 05-03396
02/28/2005Other Other. Received table of contents and table of authorities to Opening Brief. Attached to inside front cover of originals and copies of brief.
03/14/2005BriefFiled Answering Brief. 05-05048
03/28/2005BriefFiled Reply Brief. 05-06031
10/18/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 06-21492
10/18/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP06-WM/MG/JH
11/17/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order denying judicial review." SNP06-WM/MG/JH 06-23635
12/12/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-24450
12/12/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/18/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 15, 2006. 06-24450