judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FLOORS N MORE, LLC VS. ADMINISTRATOR OF DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 47864
Short Caption:FLOORS N MORE, LLC VS. ADMINISTRATOR OF DEPT. OF EMPLOYMENTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A512699Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kravitz firm - check no. 131895.
08/17/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17206
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/30/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18029
09/01/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18153
09/05/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-18305
10/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-21124
10/23/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-21748
10/30/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-22055
10/30/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. (on settlement judge) . Due date: 10 days.
11/02/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Affidavit of Mailing Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice on the Settlement Judge. 06-22457
11/03/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice served on Settlement Judge. 06-22527
11/06/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-22576
11/06/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.