judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (WILLIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47846
Short Caption:SMITH (WILLIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43097 , 44333 , 45040 , 46082 , 50551 , 51627 , 53573 , 54096 , 58880 , 67819 , 67819-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197707Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/15/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/15/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-16976
09/05/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. fn1-[ It appears that the district court may have appointed Laura Ungaro to represent appellant on appeal. However, thus far, no notice of appearance has been entered by Ms. Ungaro.] The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for appellant. Within 5 days from the date of appointment, the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order appointing appellate counsel. 06-18232
09/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. District Court Minutes appointing Laura Ungaro as counsel for appellant. 06-19160
09/18/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days.
09/25/2006MotionFiled Motion. 06-19594
10/20/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw as Counsel and Remanding to the District Court for the Limited Purpose of Appointing New Counsel. The clerk shall remove Ms. Ungaro from the docket of this appeal. The filing dates set forth in this court's September 18, 2006, notice are stayed pending further notice from this court. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for appellant. Within 5 days from the date of appointment, the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's order appointing appellant counsel. 06-21630
11/08/2006Other Other. Filed District Court minutes appointing JoNell Thomas as counsel for appellant (submitted in response to order filed 10/20/06). 06-22931
11/08/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days
11/13/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. JoNell Thomas as counsel for appellant. 06-23221
11/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/11/06 & 6/20/06. To Court Reporter: Joann Orduna. 06-23222
11/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/1/04; 4/14/04; 7/19/04; 7/21/04; 9/27/04; 11/8/04; and 11/23/04. To Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 06-23223
11/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 5/15/06 & 5/16/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-23224
11/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 4/25/06. To Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. 06-23226
11/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/12/04; 5/4/04; 11/2/04; 1/6/05; 4/28/05; 5/2/05; 6/16/05; 6/30/05; and 7/27/05. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 06-23229
11/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/1/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 06-23232
11/15/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-23434
11/21/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant's counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. fn3[This court expects counsel to investigate whether any documents in the custody of prison officials, will verify whether appellant submitted the notice of appeal to a prison official for mailing before the 30-day appeal period expired. Counsel shall submit certified copies with the response to this court's order to show cause.] 06-23899
11/27/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 1, 2006. Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. 06-24200
12/04/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/19/04; 7/21/04; 11/8/04; and 11/23/04. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 06-24728
12/11/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 06-25269
12/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/11/06 & 6/20/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-25549
12/29/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/15/06 & 5/16/06. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-26716
01/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. Counsel shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to the order to show cause. Alternatively, if appellant desires to voluntarily withdraw this appeal, counsel shall, within the same period of time, supplement appellant's proper person request to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit containing the above-described assertions. 07-00114
01/09/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 07-00606
01/11/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of Response to the Order to Show Cause. 07-00840
01/17/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorney General: Assist Ms. Thomas with obtaining a prison log or notice that the prison log does not indicate that appellant delivered his notice of appeal to a prison official. 07-01214
01/19/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Erik A. Levin, Deputy Attorney General represents the interests of the State of Nevada. 07-01488
01/23/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 1/12/04; 5/4/04; 11/2/04; 11/16/04; 1/6/05; 4/28/05; 6/16/05; 6/30/05; and 7/27/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 07-01785
02/13/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. re: prison log 07-03578
02/28/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn5[We have considered the proper person documents received on December 5 and 12, 2006, and deny the relief requested as moot.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-04774
03/05/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/25/06. Court Reporter: Cheryl Gardner. 07-05240
03/27/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-06707
03/27/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/05/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 30, 2007. 07-06707