judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CORREA VS. T-WEST SALES & SERVICE

Case Information: 43999
Short Caption:CORREA VS. T-WEST SALES & SERVICECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A457579Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:10/05/2004 / Osko, EugeneSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/2004Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Dean Y. Kajioka Esq. P.C.--check no. 3718.
09/27/2004Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 04-17819
10/05/2004Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eugene Osko. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/18/2004Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 04-19204
11/01/2004Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 04-20083
11/01/2004Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 04-20084
11/16/2004Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 04-20995
11/16/2004Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.