Case Information: 89-AA-0254 | |||
Short Caption: | JAMES S. NEAL V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 04/12/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/12/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/22/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 10/05/1989 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/21/1990 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/26/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | James Neal | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | NEAL, JAMES S. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES (WORKERS' COMP) | |||
03/20/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/20/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/20/1989 | RECEIVED PETITION FOR REVIEW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/12/1989 | ORDER GRANT F/P MO OF PTNR & CLK TO FL PFR; PTNR TO FL DSA IN 10 & RESP TO FL REC IN 15. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040789 SCHPRD Q | |||
04/12/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/18/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD DSA | |||
05/04/1989 | ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD WITHIN 15 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/22/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/22/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD R | |||
06/22/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/25/1989 | ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO FL RECORD; APLA BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 071489 SCHPRD M | |||
07/25/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/05/1989 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 090589 SCHPRD BA | |||
09/08/1989 | STATEMENT OF APPELLEE IN LIEU OF BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD BE | |||
10/05/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/05/1989 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF **FOR ADS PURPOSE ONLY, STATE- MENT FL IN LIEU OF BE** DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/05/1989 | ORDER CLK TO SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD X | |||
02/21/1990 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/21/1990 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWBEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/21/1990 | SUBMITTED PANELNWBEFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/21/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
03/26/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |