judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANDERSON VS. SANDERSON

Case Information: 47879
Short Caption:SANDERSON VS. SANDERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D295008Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/25/2006 / Trost, JanetSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Jeffrey A. Cogan, Chartered--check no. 6150.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17362
08/25/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18291
09/25/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-19608
10/24/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-21866
11/14/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-23259
12/06/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. (Jeffrey A. Cogan) 06-24957
12/12/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
12/26/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/08/04 and 06/13/06. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 06-26385
01/22/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 07-01641
02/21/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, "we dismiss this appeal." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). This matter is remanded to the district court to conduct appropriate proceedings, if any, to alter, amend, or vacate its order or judgment as necessary for the parties to fulfill the terms of their stipulated agreement. In the event the district court declines to grant the requested relief, appellant may file a motion to reinstate this appeal. SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-04204
03/20/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-05899
03/20/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/29/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 23, 2007. 07-05899