Case Information: 90-CF-0528 | |||
Short Caption: | ROBERT HOLBROOK V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F1553-89 | Filed Date: | 04/20/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/20/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/25/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 09/04/1990 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/27/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/19/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Robert Holbrook | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HOLBROOK, ROBERT UNITED STATES | |||
04/20/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
05/08/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) FLORENCE LEWIS SMITH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/17/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PF PANEL SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD DSA | |||
06/25/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/25/1990 | ACTION SLIP MAILED PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/25/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL (135 PGS - BREMEN) PF PANEL SCDATE 061990 SCHPRD R | |||
08/03/1990 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 080690 SCHPRD BA | |||
09/04/1990 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
09/04/1990 | APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 091090 SCHPRD BE | |||
09/10/1990 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/27/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/27/1991 | SUBMITTED PANELTEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/29/1991 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF JMT ON APPEAL PANELTEFAGA SCDATE 032791 SCHPRD CSUM | |||
03/29/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
04/19/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |