judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KALDY VS. KALDY (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 47880
Short Caption:KALDY VS. KALDY (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D342699Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Adams & Rocheleau, LLC--check no. 30813.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17375
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell.. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/01/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18172
09/08/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-18603
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20469
11/17/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. 06-23654
01/03/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Settlement Judge requests a 30 day extension to file final status report. 07-00167
01/25/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The settlement judge shall file the final status report within 30 days from the date of this order. 07-01981
01/30/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 07-02423
01/30/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Expedited Filing Deadlines. Courtesy notice only. Order reinstating briefing will follow. 07-02425
02/05/2007Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Pursuant to NRAP 3E. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing the fast track statement and response. Appellant: 10 days to request transcripts by filing a request form in the district court and filing 2 file-stamped copies of that request form with this court. See NRAP 3E(c)(2); 40 days to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days from the service of appellant's fast track statement to file and serve the fast track response. 07-02839
02/20/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/06/06. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 07-04097
02/20/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Request for Transcripts. 07-04100
02/22/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. McFarling Law Group in place and stead of Alan Bray. 07-04242
02/26/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 07-04557
03/15/2007Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: March 26, 2007. 07-06111
03/28/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 07-06970
03/28/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-06972
04/18/2007Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 07-08696
04/18/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 07-08697
04/30/2007Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Child Custody Fast Track Response.
06/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn8[We have determined that oral argument is not warranted in this appeal.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-12554
07/05/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-13571
07/05/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/13/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2007. 07-13571
11/19/2007MotionFiled Motion. Respondent's Motion to Publish Order. 07-25206
11/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Respondent's Motion to Publish Order. 07-25207
11/21/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service for Respondent's Motion to Publish Order. 07-25437
06/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Publish. We deny the motion to publish. 08-14924