judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FRIEDMAN (KENNETH) VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 47881
Short Caption:FRIEDMAN (KENNETH) VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 47063
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C190794Classification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2006Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition with Respect to Property Siezed and Indefinately Withheld by the State. 06-17383
09/20/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-19323
11/14/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Returning Motion Unfiled. On October 11, 2006, appellant deposited in the Supreme Court drop box a proper person "Motion for Reconsideration of Rehearing En Banc" (motion). The motion was received in the office of the clerk in Carson City on October 13, 2006. Any petition for rehearing was due to be filed on or before October 9, 2006. As appellant's motion was submitted on October 11, 2006, it is untimely. To the extend appellant's motion seeks en banc reconsideration of the panel's decision, the motion is not allowed. The clerk shall return, unfiled, appellant's Motion received on October 13, 2006. 06-23250
11/14/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion for Reconsideration or Rehearing En Banc received on October 13, 2006, to petitioner Kenneth A. Friedman.
11/14/2006RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 06-23322
11/14/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/16/2006Other Returned Unfiled Document. Original and two copies of the document entitled, "Supplemental to Motion for Reconsideration and Update" returned to Appellant Kenneth Friedman.