judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

A AND H INS. VS. JAEHN CONSTRUCTION WEST

Case Information: 47882
Short Caption:A AND H INS. VS. JAEHN CONSTRUCTION WESTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A496310Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/25/2006 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Faux & Assoc. - check no. 002405.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17384
08/25/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/13/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18870
09/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18890
09/25/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Case Appeal Statement. 06-19601
10/10/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-20700
10/23/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. (Amended) The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter (LETTERS ATTACHED TO REPORT STRICKEN PER ORDER FILED 11/14/06). 06-21725
10/31/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties.
11/14/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. We note that the settlement judge did not make any recommendation regarding possible sanctions. Rather, counsels' letters were simply attached to the report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Accordingly, we take no action in response to counsels' letters. Further, as the letters contain information and allegations outside of the record for this court's review, the clerk shall strike the copies of the letters attached to the settlement judge's report. 06-23351
11/16/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellants' response is served. 06-23538
12/04/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 30, 2006. To Court Reporter: Marybeth Cook. 06-24715
12/04/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-24716
12/15/2006MotionFiled Reply to Response. To appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-25651
01/05/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-00386
01/30/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01985
01/30/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2007. 07-01985