judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

URBAN (JEROME) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47883
Short Caption:URBAN (JEROME) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 56443
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR042704Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/06/2007How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17386
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17387
08/21/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/22/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts.
11/14/2006MotionFiled Motion. Attorney Michael V. Roth. 06-23299
12/12/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. The district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to appoint counsel for appellant. If the district court determines that appellant is not indigent, the district court shall direct appellant to retain counsel and cause counsel to enter a notice of appearance with the district court within the same time period. Within 5 days from the date of appointment or appearance, the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order or counsel's notice of appearance. The briefing schedule and deadlines for other required documents are suspended pending further notification or order of this court. 06-25392
01/25/2007Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Appointing Counsel filed in district court on January 9, 2007. Scott W. Edwards is appointed to respresent appellant in this appeal. 07-02030
01/25/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. 07-02031
02/21/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. 07-04194
02/28/2007Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 07-04816
02/28/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 10, 11, 12, 2006. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. 07-04817
03/22/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 12, 2006. Court Reporter: Corrie L. Wolden. 07-06572
03/27/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/10/06. Court Reporter: Debora Cecere. 07-06921
04/16/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 11, 2006. Court Reporter: Lesley Clarkson. 07-08566
04/30/2007MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time [First Request.] RETURNED, UNFILED, PER ORDER OF MAY 8, 2007. 07-09590
05/08/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Proper Person Document. The clerk shall return, unfiled, the appellant's proper person document received on April 30, 2007. Fn1 [The clerk shall file the proper person document received on April 20, 2007. The clerk shall return, unfiled, any future proper person document submitted for filing.] 07-10249
05/08/2007Other Returned Unfiled Document. Motion for Enlargement of Time [First Request]. 07-09590
05/08/2007Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter requesting the Court to Appoint-"Re-Appoint" New Counsel and an Extension to hear appeal. 07-08864
05/29/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 24, 2007. 07-11736
06/22/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-13728
07/03/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Opening Brief due: July 24, 2007. 07-14518
07/24/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-16220
07/24/2007AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 07-16221
08/24/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-18807
10/04/2007Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
12/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-26498
12/06/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/10/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 08-00658
02/05/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-02094
02/05/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/13/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 07, 2008. 08-02094