Case Information: 90-CF-0520 | |||
Short Caption: | JOHN E. THOMAS, JR. V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F5804-87 | Filed Date: | 03/01/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/01/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/02/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/29/1990 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/23/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/19/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | John E. Thomas, Jr. | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | THOMAS JR., JOHN E. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 5/21/90 ORD: THAT THE BRF OF NOTE - 01 APLT DUE ON 6/21/90, THE BRF NOTE - 02 OF APLE DUE ON 7/20/90, AND NOTE - 02 THE REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE ON NOTE - 03 7/30/90. FO THAT NO EXTS OF NOTE - 03 TIME WILL BE ALLOWED ABSENT NOTE - 04 EXTRAORDINARY CIRCUMSTANCES. NOTE - 04 | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 91/01/23 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - DOWLUTR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - VALLIEREB FOR - APPELLEE | |||
03/01/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
05/02/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/02/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL PF PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD R | |||
05/04/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) ROBERT J. DOWLUT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
05/14/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 051490 SCHPRD BA | |||
05/21/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELFF SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
06/21/1990 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 072590 SCHPRD BA | |||
06/21/1990 | ORDER SS AMENDING BRF SCHD: APLT DUE 7/25; APLE DUE 8/29; RBA IF ANY DUE 9/13. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/29/1990 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
08/29/1990 | APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD BE | |||
09/17/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 091390 SCHPRD RBA | |||
09/17/1990 | RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/09/1990 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD V | |||
12/06/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/13/1990 | SUMMARY I CALENDAR GRANT APLT'S LTR REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT. CT PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/23/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/23/1991 | ARGUED PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/26/1991 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGFEKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/26/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 586 A.2d 1228 | |||
02/26/1991 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 0540 | |||
03/19/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |