Case Information: 89-AA-0361 | |||
Short Caption: | OFFICE OF THE PEOPLE'S COUNSEL V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 04/17/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/17/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/27/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 08/24/1989 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/01/1989 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/11/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | Office of the People's Counsel | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | Public Service Commission | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | OFFICE OF THE PEOPLE'S COUNSEL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 6/27/89 ORD: GRT RESPONDENT'S NOTE - 01 MOTIONS AND THE RECORD IS NOTE - 02 HEREBY FILED. FO THAT NOTE - 02 DOCUMENT NOS. 2, 6, 11, 12, NOTE - 03 13, 14, 15, 19, 31, 32, AND 52 NOTE - 03 INDICATED BY THE INDEX OF THE NOTE - 04 RECORD ARE HEREBY SEALED. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 7/25/89 ORD: THAT RESPONDENT NOTE - 05 AND INTERVNR W/I 30 DAYS MAY NOTE - 06 FILE BRIEFS IN RESPONSE TO THE NOTE - 06 PETITION OF APPEAL FILED NOTE - 07 HEREIN ON 4/17/89. NOTE - 07 | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 89/11/01 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WATSONM FOR - PETITIONER ATTY 2 - DAVENPORTH FOR - RESPONDENT ATTY 3 - SATTERFIELDL FOR - INTERVENOR | |||
01/01/1906 | SATTERFIELDL FOR: (C&P) WELCHT FOR: (C&P) | |||
04/17/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/17/1989 | PETITION OF APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/08/1989 | RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO PETITION OF APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/08/1989 | RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RECORD TO 6/7/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 050889 SCHPRD R | |||
05/12/1989 | NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE OF CHESAPEAKE & POTOMAC TELE- PHONE COMPANY (C&P) ON BEHALF OF APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/26/1989 | MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION OF APLE TO FILE PORTIONS OF THE RECORD UNDER SEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/31/1989 | RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL (1 BOX) AND EXHIBITS (1 BOX) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/27/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/27/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 4 SL PANELRBH SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
06/27/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL SEPARATE EXHIBITS ARE UNDER SEAL LOCATED IN THE COMPUTER ROOM SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/25/1989 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5 THRU 7 SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/24/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
08/24/1989 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF (PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION) RJG PANEL SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD BE | |||
08/24/1989 | INTERVENOR'S BRIEF (THE CHESAPEAK & POTOMAC COMPANY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 082489 SCHPRD BI | |||
08/24/1989 | INTV MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (CHESAPEAK & POTOMAC TELEPHONE COMPANY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/13/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO OF INTVNR TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL ORDS 9172,9273, 9324,9327 & 9331 AS SUPP REC. PANELRO SCDATE 082589 SCHPRD Q | |||
09/13/1989 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD PUBLIC SVC. COMM. ORDER NOS. 9172, 9273, 9324, 9327, & 9331. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/01/1989 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
11/01/1989 | ARGUED PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/14/1990 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/14/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -FE CITE 572 A.2d 410 | |||
03/14/1990 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - FE PAGE # - 0654 OPINION TYPE C JUDGE - NW PAGE # - 0000 (CC/DS IN PART) | |||
04/11/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |