judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST. VS. CLARK CO. EDUC. ASSOC.

Case Information: 47868
Short Caption:CLARK CO. SCHOOL DIST. VS. CLARK CO. EDUC. ASSOC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A511175Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17249
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/31/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18101
09/01/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18156
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-20452
10/10/2006MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Appellant Clark Co. School District's Motion for Stay. 06-20677
10/19/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). fn1[We defer ruling on appellant's motion for a stay at this time.] 06-21545
10/23/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent's Opposition to Motion for Stay. 06-21819
10/30/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. fn4[Due to the potential jurisdictional defect in this appeal, we defer ruling on appellant's motion for a stay, until the issue is resolved. 06-22059
11/02/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-22373
11/02/2006MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. MOTION DENIED 12/8/06 AND REPLY WAS DISCARDED PER JB. 06-22388
11/09/2006MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 06-22969
11/27/2006MotionFiled Reply to Response. 06-24240
12/08/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07B-NB/JH/RP. Fn2 [In light of our disposition of this appeal, we deny as moot appellant's motion for a stay and motion to file a reply to respondents' opposition to the motion for a stay.] 06-25085
01/03/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00101
01/03/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 8, 2007. 07-00101