judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIEBERT VS. LIEBERT

Case Information: 47867
Short Caption:LIEBERT VS. LIEBERTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41610 , 47827
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D282975Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bruce I. Shapiro - check no. 4818.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17232
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/22/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement.
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20458
10/13/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-21076
12/18/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 47827/47867-cases are not consolidated. 06-25777
02/05/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 07-02875
03/05/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a tentative settlement of this matter. Each party to contact Settlement Judge by 4/6/07. 07-05190
04/19/2007Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. Nos. 47827/47867-cases are not consolidated. 07-08775
08/23/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 07-18742
09/10/2007MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 47827/47867-cases are not consolidated. 07-19905
09/10/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 07-19906
09/26/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing served upon Settlement Judge Shirinian. Nos. 47827/47867-cases are not consolidated. 07-21275
12/10/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP-TH 07-26639
12/10/2007Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.