judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSEN FAMILY ASSOC. VS. RICCI, STATE ENGINEER

Case Information: 47878
Short Caption:ANDERSEN FAMILY ASSOC. VS. RICCI, STATE ENGINEERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0600175AClassification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/25/2006 / Shipman, MadelynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/03/2007 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/03/2007How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Parsons Behle & Latimer--check no. 1246.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17353
08/25/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Madelyn Shipman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/07/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18484
09/12/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-18799
09/15/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation and should be removed from the settlement conference program. 06-19086
09/29/2006Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing. Pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, this appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-19966
10/13/2006Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 06-21164
11/21/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Parsons firm. 06-23839
12/18/2006BriefFiled Opening Brief. 06-25817
12/18/2006AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 06-25818
01/17/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent Nevada State Engineer's Answering Brief. 07-01223
01/17/2007BriefFiled Joinder to Brief. Carson City's Joinder to State's Answering Brief. 07-01231
02/16/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-03985
10/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on December 3, 2007 at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc) 07-23118
11/19/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 07-25089
12/03/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/27/2008Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Parraguirre, Ron. Majority: Parraguirre/Gibbons/Maupin/Hardesty/Douglas/Cherry/Saitta. 124 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 17. Copies have been distributed to all counsel, the district judge, and the district court clerk per this court's docket. EN BANC. 08-07531
04/22/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-08088
04/22/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 23, 2008. 08-08088