judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANTEE (CORNELIUS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47877
Short Caption:ANTEE (CORNELIUS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211966Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/02/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 06-17292
09/11/2006MotionFiled Motion. Clark County Public Defender Office's Motion to Withdraw Due to Error in District Court Order and Conflict of Interest with Client. 06-18751
09/27/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 9/11/06. The Clark County Public Defender is relieved of any further obligation with respect to this appeal, which will proceed as a proper person appeal. 06-19766
10/06/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-20553
11/02/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-22446
11/02/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental record (transcripts) due: 30 days. 06-25691
01/03/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/31/05; 7/19/05; and 6/22/06. Court Reporter: Dick Kangas (submitted in response to order filed 12/15/06). 07-00228
02/01/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-02573
02/28/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04394
02/28/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/14/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2007. 07-04394