judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRASS VS. PARK PLACE ENTM'T CORP.

Case Information: 47888
Short Caption:GRASS VS. PARK PLACE ENTM'T CORP.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A440551Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/12/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Donna Lee Schubert - check no. 1808.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17397
08/24/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Transmit 7/11/06 Judgment and 7/14/06 Notice of Entry. Due Date: 10 days.
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/31/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Judgment Upon Jury Verdict filed on July 11, 2006 and Notice of Entry of Judgment on Jury Verdict filed on July 14, 2006. 06-18087
08/31/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18109
09/13/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-18887
09/25/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 9, 2006. 06-19610
10/02/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. 06-20220
10/16/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 1, 2006. 06-21260
12/08/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-25133
12/13/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. We reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 06-25469
01/10/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts.
02/15/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 16, 17, 19, 2006. To Court Reporter: Billie Jo Craig (Dep't 2). 07-03848
03/19/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-06276
03/19/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Second Amended Request for Transcripts requested: May 16, 17, 19, 2007. To Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 07-06277
03/19/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 16, 17, 19, 2006. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 07-06299
03/30/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed 3/19/07. Opening Brief due: 5/13/07. 07-07260
05/18/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 60 days. 07-11070
06/01/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: July 13, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-12024
07/18/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 34 pages. 07-15654
07/18/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-15655
07/18/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 07-15656
08/23/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 9/13/07. 07-18729
09/17/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-20452
09/17/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 07-20453
10/19/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-23088
10/19/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. 07-23089
02/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 08-03417
02/12/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/07/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. 08-11316
06/03/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-12053
06/03/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/11/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 5, 2008. 08-12053