judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETERS (RICHARD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47887
Short Caption:PETERS (RICHARD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 68145 , 70468 , 70468-COA , 70894
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C194675Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/06/2007How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17394
09/05/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 06/01/06, 06/05/06-06/08/06,06/26/06, and 07/19/06. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio and JoAnn Orduna. 06-18295
09/05/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/09/03, 04/05/04, 04/21/04, 05/05/04, 07/13/04, 01/20/05, 02/08/05, 03/08/05, 05/02/05, 07/25/05, and 08/02/05. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 06-18297
09/05/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18299
09/14/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 09/09/03, 04/21/04, 05/05/04, 07/13/04, 01/20/05, 02/08/05, 03/08/05, 04/05/04, 05/02/05, 07/25/05, and 08/02/05. Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. 06-19020
09/29/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 1, 2006 and June 26, 2006. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. 06-19980
10/06/2006Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from court reporter Julie Lever requesting an extension of time. 06-20548
10/10/2006Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Transcript conducted on June 5 and 6, 2006 due: November 6, 2006. 06-20680
11/13/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/5/06 & 6/6/06. Court Reporter: Julie M. Lever. 06-23162
11/20/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Wednesday, June 7, 2006; July 19, 2006. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-23784
11/30/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-24516
12/15/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file the opening brief and order to file transcripts. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] Transcripts due: 20 days. If more time is needed, Ms. Orduna shall file a motion for an extension of time or if the transcripts cannot be produced, she shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. Opening brief and appendix due: February 9, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 06-25686
01/16/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 06/08/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 07-01121
02/20/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-04056
03/15/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Opening brief and appendix due: 30 days. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. We direct Ms. Orduna to deliver a copy of the June 8, 2006, transcript to appellant within 10 days. Appellant shall pay Ms. Orduna the deposit for the transcript if he has not already done so. 07-06107
05/11/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Application for Extension of Time. 07-10529
06/04/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for Extension of Time and Regarding Proper Person Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: 10 days. On May 14, 2007, appellant submitted a proper person motion that this court appoint him a new attorney. fn1[Appellant has neither sought nor been granted permission to file documents in proper person. We elect to resolve the proper person document on its merits, and direct the clerk to file the proper person motion received on May 14, 2007. We decline to grant appellant permission to file additional documents in proper person. The clerk shall return, unfiled, any future proper person documents submitted to this court.] We conclude that appellant has failed to demonstrate good cause for removal of his appellate counsel and failed to demonstrate good cause for a show cause order or to stay briefing. We deny appellant's proper person motion in its entirety. Appellant shall proceed hereafter through his counsel. 07-12142
06/04/2007MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Emergency Pro Per Motion for: a Show Cause Order; Order Staying Opening Brief Filing; and for Substitute Counsel Appointment. 07-10658
06/11/2007MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 07-12746
06/13/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Opening brief and appendix due: July 5, 2007. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 07-12893
07/09/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-14958
07/09/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 07-14959
07/23/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Courtesy copy of letter from attorney Bret Whipple addressed to Richard Peters regarding the status of his appeal. 07-16041
08/07/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 7, 2007. 07-17347
08/13/2007Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Courtesy copy of letter from Bret Whipple addressed to appellant regarding contacting him and the status of his case. 07-17835
08/29/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-19150
09/28/2007MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 31, 2007. 07-21494
10/29/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-23668
12/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 07-26483
12/06/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/14/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-20977
09/09/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-21193
09/09/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/16/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 11, 2008. 08-21193
12/06/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Clark County Clerk returning State's Exhibit #2-(Videotape of Defendant's Interview of June 23, 2003). 12-38483