Case Information: 90-CF-0501 | |||
Short Caption: | DONALD A. TOWNSEND V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F1877-82 | Filed Date: | 04/27/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/27/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 06/13/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/17/1991 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/05/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 05/24/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Donald A. Townsend | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TOWNSEND, DONALD A. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 6/8/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 01 FOR APPT OF COUNSEL; APPOINTG NOTE - 02 PAUL ZUKERBERG, ESQ.; NEW NOTE - 02 COUNSEL TO FILE DOCKETING STMT NOTE - 03 W/IN 10 DAYS; CLK OF SUPER CT NOTE - 03 TO TRANSMIT REC FORTHWITH; BRF NOTE - 04 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 04 COMPLETE RECORD. NOTE - 05 08/08/90 ORD: GRANT APLT'S MO NOTE - 05 TO FL DSA & CLK TO FL LODGED NOTE - 06 DSA; F/O COUNSL FOR APLT TO FL NOTE - 06 STATMT W/IN 20 DAYS ADVISING NOTE - 07 THIS CRT WHETHER REPORTER'S NOTE - 07 TRANSCRIPT WILL BE ORDERED FOR NOTE - 08 PURPOSE OF THIS APPEAL. NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 10/26/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 09 BY 12/06/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 10 BY 01/10/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 10 01/29/91; SCED CASE ON NOTE - 11 MARCH 1991 CAL; NFX NOTE - 11 | |||
01/01/1904 | JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y | |||
04/27/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
05/04/1990 | RECEIVED PRO SE MOTION FROM APPELLANT FOR APPOINTMENT OF CJA ATTORNEY RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/08/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) PAUL H. ZUKERBERG, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/08/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/13/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/13/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD R | |||
06/28/1990 | ORDER DIRG DSA IN 10 OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHUD NOT BE VACATED UNDER CJA. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/17/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS GG PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD GG | |||
07/17/1990 | RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/08/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/08/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 05 THUR 08. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 080290 SCHPRD K | |||
08/27/1990 | STATEMENT OF APLT TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD STATE | |||
10/26/1990 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09 - 11 FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD GR | |||
12/06/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 7 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 120690 SCHPRD BA | |||
12/13/1990 | RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/20/1990 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/20/1990 | ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM & BRF OF APLT IS FL. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/17/1991 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
01/17/1991 | APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 011491 SCHPRD V | |||
02/05/1991 | APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF FOR A 14 DAY EXTENSION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/11/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/11/1991 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/12/1991 | ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT TO EXT TM TO FL RBA. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD VS | |||
02/12/1991 | APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 021391 SCHPRD OPE | |||
03/05/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/05/1991 | SUBMITTED PANELSTSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/07/1991 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF ORDER APPEALED FROM PANELSTSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/07/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
03/21/1991 | AFFIRMED OF APPELLANT PRO SE PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/21/1991 | MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/22/1991 | RECEIVED PETITION FOR REHEARING OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, REHEARING EN- BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/02/1991 | PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC FILED BY COUNSEL FOR APPELLANT SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/02/1991 | ORDER GRT MO. OF COUNSEL FOR APLT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC SL PANELRO SCDATE 040291 SCHPRD OPE | |||
05/24/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |