judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BURGESS VS. CITY OF RENO

Case Information: 34798
Short Caption:BURGESS VS. CITY OF RENOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR990803Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/17/1999 / Cashill, Wm.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08520
09/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/17/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William Patterson Cashill. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and/or for Exemption from the NRAP 16 Settlement Program. 99-09094
09/24/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Arnold Brock, Jr.-check no. 10237.
12/06/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On September 23, 1999, respondent moved to dismiss this appeal because this court lacked jurisdiction. Appellant has failed to file a response. We conclude that this court lacks jurisdiction to entertain this appeal, and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML. 99-12144
01/04/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-00076
01/04/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/10/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2000. 00-00076