judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREW J. JOHNSON v. JILL WATSON, Warden, Rollling Plains Regional Detention Center; ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director Wyoming Department of Corrections; and PATRICK CRANK, Wyoming Attorney General

Case Heading (06-97)
Case Number:06-97Case Docketed On:05/01/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Habeas Corpus
Short Title:ANDREW J. JOHNSON v. JILL WATSON, Warden, Rollling Plains Regional Detention Center; ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director Wyoming Department of Corrections; and PATRICK CRANK, Wyoming Attorney General
Full Title:ANDREW J. JOHNSON, Petitioner, v. JILL WATSON, Warden, Rollling Plains Regional Detention Center; ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director Wyoming Department of Corrections; and PATRICK CRANK, Wyoming Attorney General, Respondents.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerAndrew J. Johnson Pro Se
RespondentJill WatsonPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
RespondentRobert O. LampertPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
RespondentPatrick J. CrankPaul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling
David L. Delicath
Patrick J. Crank

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/01/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/01/2006Petition - Writ - habeas corpusPetitionWrit - habeas corpusFinal
05/01/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Other, sent copies of pleadings to Attorney General's office this dateNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
05/09/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/16/2006Order - Denying petition for writ of habeas corpusOrderDenyFinal
05/16/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/22/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss (received)Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/24/2006Correspondence - Outgoing to petitioner indicating that the order denying petition stands as the Court's decision.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal