judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HIRJI VS. ERRICO

Case Information: 47891
Short Caption:HIRJI VS. ERRICOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A480626Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:ParraguirreCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice ParraguirrePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/08/2007How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/22/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Rawlings firm - check no. 91110.
08/22/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17412
08/22/2006OtherDisqualification of Justice Parraguirre. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/31/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18110
09/07/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18490
09/19/2006MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 06-19279
09/21/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 06-19483
09/22/2006MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Response in Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 06-19495
10/09/2006Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The settlement proceedings are concluded and this appeal may proceed. Briefing and compliance with NRAP 9(a) shall remain suspended, however, pending resolution of respondent's motion to dismiss appeal. 06-20606
10/17/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Denying Motion to Dismiss and Reinstating Briefing. We conclude that we have jurisdiction over this appeal, and we deny respondents' motion to dismiss. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 90 days. 06-21286
10/31/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 07/26/04, 10/12/05, and 10/13/05. To Court Reporter: Jean Dahlberg and Lee Bahr. 06-22213
11/28/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Supplemental Request. Transcripts requested: 09/27/04. To Court Reporter: James Helleso. 06-24319
12/06/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 12 and 13, 2005 (2 volumes). Court Reporter: Lee M. Bahr. 06-24949
12/20/2006MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 45 pages (opening brief). 06-26077
01/16/2007BriefFiled Opening Brief. 07-01021
01/16/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 8. 07-01022
01/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, the July 26, 2004, and September 27, 2004, transcripts have not been filed in this court. Appellants included file-stamped copies of these transcripts in the appendix to their opening brief. No court reporter or recorder is obligated to file transcripts for proceedings held on July 26, 2004, or September 27, 2004, in this court. 07-02186
02/15/2007MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 2, 2007. 07-03793
02/21/2007Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name. Rawlings, Olson, Cannon, Gormley & Desruisseaux has changed to Olson, Cannon, Gormley & Desruisseaux. 07-04114
03/06/2007BriefFiled Answering Brief. 07-05331
03/06/2007AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. 07-05332
04/03/2007BriefFiled Reply Brief. 07-07390
11/08/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. SNP08-WM/JH/MD. 07-24382
11/08/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/30/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-WM/JH/MD 08-02358
02/26/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-04293
02/26/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/29/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 27, 2008 08-04293