judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HESKETT VS. CHARLESTON AUTO PARTS, INC.

Case Information: 47890
Short Caption:HESKETT VS. CHARLESTON AUTO PARTS, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A477685Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/25/2006 / Roitman, HowardSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/21/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Harold P. Gewerter - check no. 188.
08/21/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17402
08/25/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Howard Roitman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/05/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 06-18293
09/13/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18888
11/06/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-22682
11/14/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 06-23302
02/16/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has not responded to our order or otherwise communicated with this court. "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-03909
03/13/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-05474
03/13/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/21/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 16, 2007. 07-05474