judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MORELAND (MARRIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47860
Short Caption:MORELAND (MARRIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42825 , 48115
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C196411Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/29/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17132
09/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. 06-18228
09/08/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order/Judgment filed in district court on August 29, 2006. 06-18592
09/29/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-19958
09/29/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/03/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Record on Appeal. The record filed in Docket No. 47860 shall be considered by this court in resolving both above-captioned appeals. Further, we hereby modify our order of October 6, 2006, in Docket No. 48115 directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the complete trial court record. The clerk of the district court shall have 20 days from the date of this order to certify and transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, those documents filed in Case No. C196411 after transmission of the former record on appeal. If no additional documents have been filed in Case No. C196411 since transmission of the former record, the clerk of the district court shall so notify this court in writing within the same time period. Nos. 47860/48115. 06-22555
01/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-00536
02/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01998
02/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 6, 2007. 07-01998