Case Information: 89-AA-0290 | |||
Short Caption: | SAPPHIRE COMMUNICATIONS OF V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 03/28/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/28/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/09/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Intervenor-Respondent | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | Sapphire Communications of | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | Public Service Commission | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SAPPHIRE COMMUNICATIONS OF WASHINGTON, D.C., INC. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA | |||
01/01/1906 | SATTERFIELDL (C&P) WELCHT (C&P) | |||
03/28/1989 | PETITION OF APPEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/28/1989 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/29/1989 | CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/29/1989 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/07/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/13/1989 | RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO PETITION OF APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/13/1989 | RESP MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE THE RECORD TO 5/17/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 021789 SCHPRD R | |||
04/19/1989 | NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE OF CHESAPEAKE & POTOMAC TELE- PHONE CO (C&P) ON BEHALF OF APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/11/1989 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLEE TO FILE PORTIONS OF RECORD UNDER SEAL MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/17/1989 | RECEIVED AGENCY RECORD (4 LARGE BOXES OF RECORDS / 1 LARGE BOX OF CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
06/13/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
06/23/1989 | MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION 0F APPELLEE (PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION OF D.C.) FOR REIM- BUSMENT OF COST GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/06/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
07/06/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD M | |||
07/06/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
08/09/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/30/1989 | ORDER GRANT RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR COST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,201. 80. PB PANELFETE SCDATE 080489 SCHPRD VS |