judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIPER (MAYFIELD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47861
Short Caption:KIPER (MAYFIELD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0600266HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/12/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17134
09/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18225
10/12/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 06-21011
10/12/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/22/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC 07-06558
04/17/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-08132
04/17/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/24/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 18, 2007. 07-08132