judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DANIEL MORONTA V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT

Case Information: 89-AA-0294
Short Caption:DANIEL MORONTA V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENTClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/07/1989

Opening Event Date:04/07/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/05/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/23/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
Thomas G. Hagerty YN
Intervenor-RespondentJohn Doe N
John S. Nevin NN
PetitionerDaniel Moronta NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment ServicesN
Charles L. Reischel YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MORONTA, DANIEL D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES (WORKERS' COMP)
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/17/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF PTNR NOTE - 01 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO NOTE - 02 FL BRF OF PTNR; GRANT MO OF NOTE - 02 PTNR TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL NOTE - 03 ATTACHMENTS AS SUPP REC; GRANT NOTE - 03 MO OF WASHINGTON HILTON HOTEL NOTE - 04 FOR LV TO FL NOTICE IF INTEN NOTE - 04 TO INTERVENE & CLK TO FL; NOTE - 05 NOTICE; BRF OF RESP & INVNR NOTE - 05 DUE IN 30 DAYS. NOTE - 06 121589 ORD: GRANT MOTION OF NOTE - 06 INTERVENOR TO STRIKE IN PART, NOTE - 07 CLERK TO REMOVE FROM SUPP REC NOTE - 07 3 MEDICAL REPORTS OF DR PEDRO NOTE - 08 J. GONZALEZ, & INFORMAL RECO- NOTE - 08 MENDATION REPORT PREPARED BY NOTE - 09 OFFICE OF WORKERS COMP. NOTE - 09
01/01/1906 HAGERTYT FOR: WASHINGTON HILTON HOTEL NEVINJ FOR: WASHINGTON HILTON HOTEL
03/28/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1989RECEIVED PETITION FOR REVIEW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER GRANT F/P MO OF PTNR & CLK TO FL PFR; PTNR DUE IN 10 DAYS & RESP TO FL REC IN 15. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD Q
04/07/1989PETITION FOR REVIEW DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/10/1989PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD DSA
04/25/1989PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE (THE WASHINGTON HILTON HOTEL) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989RECEIVED NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE BY THE WASHINGTON HILTON HOTEL ON BEHALF OF APPELLEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/05/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/05/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD R
06/07/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 14, 1989 SO THAT APLT CAN OBTAIN COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 061489 SCHPRD BA
06/08/1989PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 60 DAYS JB (LAW STUDENTS COUNSEL FOR MOTION ONLY) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF, PRO SE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1989INTERVENOR'S OPPOSITION TO APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1989LETTER DATED 6/30/89 FROM TOMAS R. LOPEZ, REGARDING REPRESENTA- TION OF APPELLANT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/14/1989MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF INT. WASH. HILTON HOTEL MO. TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILED RESPONSIVE PLEADING AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989PETITIONER'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTERVENE WASHINGTON HILTON HOTEL. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/17/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-05. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 070789 SCHPRD Q
07/17/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD ATTACHMENTS. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989INTERVENOR'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BI
08/16/1989INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO STRIKE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/18/1989STATEMENT IN LIEU OF APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BE
12/15/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. MEH PANELBETE SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD VS
02/12/1990PETITIONER'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1990ORDER DENY PRO SE REQ OF PTNR FOR ARGUMENT DAS PANELNWFAMK SCDATE 021590 SCHPRD X
03/05/1990MEMORANDUM SUBMITTED TO JJ NW/FA/MK PANELNWFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990PTNR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD (WITH ATTACHMENTS) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELNWFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/07/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/14/1990MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION COURT'S DECISION RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990ORDER GRANT PRO SE MO OF PTNR TO SUP REC W/PROOF OF EMPLOYMENT DAS PANELNWFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD PROOF OF EMPLOYMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1990RECEIVED LETTER FROM MR. BEATO ON BEHALF OF DANIEL MORONTA RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S PRO SE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION SL PANELNWFAMK SCDATE 032190 SCHPRD VS
04/23/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD