judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRAMLY CONST. VS. SCHWARTZ

Case Information: 47894
Short Caption:GRAMLY CONST. VS. SCHWARTZCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A467427Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/01/2006 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/23/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Woodbury, Morris & Brown, Ltd.--check no. 1687.
08/23/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17554
08/23/2006Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
08/24/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 06-17635
08/28/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. 06-17787
09/01/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/08/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-18628
09/12/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Completed Proof of Service including Settlement Judge. 06-18789
09/19/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Docketing Statement. 06-19291
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 17, 2006. 06-20454
10/20/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 06-21670
10/20/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 06-21671
10/20/2006Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 06-21672
10/30/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-22040
10/30/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.