judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GAMBOA (REYNALDO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47858
Short Caption:GAMBOA (REYNALDO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44955
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C203789Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/10/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17127
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18546
10/10/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-20667
10/10/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-00534
02/02/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-01997
02/02/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/09/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 6, 2007. 07-01997