judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREEN (LAWRENCE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47857
Short Caption:GREEN (LAWRENCE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43721 , 44951 , 50459
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C196346Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/11/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17124
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17125
09/08/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18544
10/11/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-20836
10/11/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/23/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07-MG/MD/MC. 07-09072
05/18/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-09223
05/18/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/25/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 21, 2007. 07-09223