Case Information: 89-AA-0271 | |||
Short Caption: | ALEXANDER IVORY V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 04/07/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/07/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/04/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 09/22/1989 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/18/1990 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/11/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Alexander Ivory | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | IVORY, ALEXANDER D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | |||
03/31/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
03/31/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/31/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/07/1989 | ORDER GRANT F/P MO OF PTNR & CLK TO FL PFR; PTNR TO FL DSA IN 10 & & RESP TO FL REC IN 15. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD Q | |||
04/07/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/17/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 041789 SCHPRD DSA | |||
04/28/1989 | ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD W/IN 15 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/04/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/04/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/04/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD R | |||
06/13/1989 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 061389 SCHPRD BA | |||
07/13/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/22/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 071389 SCHPRD BE | |||
07/28/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/22/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 072589 SCHPRD OPA | |||
08/21/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/22/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 082289 SCHPRD BE | |||
09/11/1989 | ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/22/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 090689 SCHPRD M | |||
09/19/1989 | RESP MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/22/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
09/22/1989 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 092289 SCHPRD BE | |||
10/20/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO SUPP REC & CLK TO FL SUPP REC. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD Q | |||
10/20/1989 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/18/1990 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/18/1990 | SUBMITTED PANELRGFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/21/1990 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELRGFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/21/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
04/11/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |