judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NICOLAY (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47872
Short Caption:NICOLAY (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C191450Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 06-17274
08/24/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/14/06, 03/24/06, and 03/31/06. Court Reporter: Joann Orduna. Filed in district court on: 08/17/06. 06-17606
09/26/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-19680
10/09/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Court reporter or recorder JoAnn Orduna shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order. The motion for an extension of time is granted. Appellant shall have 20 days from the filing of the transcripts within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 06-20603
10/19/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 06-21534
10/19/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-21535
10/19/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 3/14/06 and 3/31/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-21596
11/09/2006Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 3/17/06 and 3/24/06. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. Filed in district court on 11/7/06. 06-23049
11/09/2006MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 06-23051
11/20/2006TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 17, 2006; March 24, 2006. Court Reporter: JoAnn Orduna. 06-23760
11/21/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track response due: 20 days. 06-23829
12/13/2006Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 06-25433
12/13/2006AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 06-25434
02/08/2007Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn3[We note that there is a clerical error in the judgment of conviction. The judgment incorrectly states that Nicolay was convicted pursuant to a jury trial. In fact, Nicolay was convicted pursuant to a bench trial. Following this court's issuance of its remittitur, the district court shall correct this error in the judgment of conviction.] NNP07-RP/JH/NS 07-03155
03/06/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-04866
03/06/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/15/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 8, 2007. 07-04866