Case Information: 90-CF-0450 | |||
Short Caption: | KENNETH R. SANDERS V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F14226-89 | Filed Date: | 04/09/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/09/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 07/02/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/18/1990 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 03/14/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 04/12/1991 |
Party Information | ||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | |||||||
Appellant | Kenneth R. Sanders | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
| |||||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SANDERS, KENNETH R. UNITED STATES | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 11/2/90 ORD: SHOW CAUSE WHY NOTE - 01 HIS APPT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED NOTE - 02 AND NAME REMOVED FOR THE PANEL NOTE - 02 OF ATTY AUTHORIZED TO RECEIVE NOTE - 03 APPOINTMENTS UNDER THE NOTE - 03 CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT. | |||
04/09/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/19/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS G. ROSS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/18/1990 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/18/1990 | RECEIVED APLT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD DSA | |||
06/11/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL TRANSCRIPT 156-RHOADES AJ PANEL SCDATE 060890 SCHPRD R | |||
06/13/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD V | |||
07/02/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
07/02/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (78 PGS.--BURNS) PR PANEL SCDATE 082190 SCHPRD RT | |||
09/12/1990 | ORDER BRF OF APLT SHALL BE FL W/IN 40 DAYS. NFX JJ. PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD B | |||
11/02/1990 | ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IS DIRECTED TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 10 DAYS OR (SEE NOTES 1 THRU 3) JB PANELRO SCDATE 102590 SCHPRD U | |||
11/13/1990 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BA | |||
12/18/1990 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
12/18/1990 | APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 121990 SCHPRD BE | |||
03/14/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/14/1991 | SUBMITTED PANELSTFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/21/1991 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELSTFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/21/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
04/12/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |