Case Information: 90-CF-0444 | |||
Short Caption: | SHERRY D. COOK V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F9937-89 | Filed Date: | 04/06/1990 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/06/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/30/1990 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 09/09/1991 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | COOK, SHERRY D. UNITED STATES | |||
04/06/1990 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/19/1990 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/01/1990 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 043090 SCHPRD DSA | |||
06/12/1990 | RECORD ON APPEAL PR PANEL SCDATE 060590 SCHPRD R | |||
08/27/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (31-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 081790 SCHPRD RT | |||
08/30/1990 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
08/30/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(121 PGS/MOORE) AD PANEL SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD RT | |||
12/14/1990 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (154-PGS/LOLLAND) AJ PANEL SCDATE 100890 SCHPRD RT | |||
01/19/1991 | ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 122490 SCHPRD B | |||
02/28/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 030191 SCHPRD BA | |||
04/22/1991 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (86 PGS. -- HOLLAND) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051191 SCHPRD RT | |||
07/02/1991 | ORDER DEN MO OF APLT TO HOLD BRFING. BA DUE 8/22/91,BE DUE 9/26/91, RBA DUE 10/15/91, JAN CAL. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD K | |||
08/07/1991 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 082291 SCHPRD BA | |||
08/14/1991 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
08/14/1991 | ORDER APLT MO TO W/DRAW APPEAL GRNTD & APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED GR PANELJWR SCDATE 070291 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
08/14/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
09/09/1991 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |