judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-7908
B-7908
09/21/1978
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
ROBERT E. STEWART, GARY POOL, THOMAS M. POLLAN, AND DON W. KOTHMANN
WALTER RUSEK, TRUSTEE, ROBERT A. MANN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/16/1979Response to PetitionRespondent
12/28/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/26/1978Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/29/1978Post submission brief filedRespondent
11/16/1978Brief on the MeritsRespondent
11/16/1978Response to PetitionRespondent
09/25/1978Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
09/25/1978Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
09/25/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/16/1979Response to Petition
01/02/1979Response to Motion filed
12/28/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/26/1978Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/13/1978Opinion issued
11/29/1978Post submission brief filed
11/16/1978Brief on the Merits
11/16/1978Response to Petition
09/25/1978Brief in Support of Petition
09/25/1978Exhibits in case/cause filed
09/25/1978Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
09/21/1978Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walter Rusek, TrusteeRespondent
Robert E. Stewart, Gary Pool, Thomas M. Pollan, and Don W. KothmannRelator
Robert A. MannRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information