judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTINEZ (ANTONIO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 47863
Short Caption:MARTINEZ (ANTONIO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C201749Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/02/2006How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/2006Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/17/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 06-17160
09/01/2006Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 60 days. 06-18220
10/02/2006Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. 06-20177
10/02/2006Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/15/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP07M-MG/WM/MD 06-25632
01/10/2007RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 07-00641
01/10/2007Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2007RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 16, 2007. 07-00641