Case Information: 89-AA-0333 | |||
Short Caption: | VERA R. SLADE V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 04/07/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 04/07/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 05/01/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 11/28/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Vera Slade | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | SLADE, VERA R. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | |||
04/03/1989 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
04/03/1989 | PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPELLANT'S RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/03/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REVIEW RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/03/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/07/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/07/1989 | ORDER GRANT F/P MO OF PTNR & CLK TO FL DSA & PFR; RESP TO FL REC IN 15 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD Q | |||
04/07/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/28/1989 | ORDER DIRG RESPONDENT TO FILE RECORD W/IN 15 DAYS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/01/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/01/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/01/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 051589 SCHPRD R | |||
06/29/1989 | ORDER DIRG PTNR TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 20 DAYS OR CASE MAY STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/22/1989 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition | ||
09/22/1989 | ORDER CASE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO FL BRF. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD BA | |||
09/22/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE | |||
11/28/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |