Case Information: 89-AA-0312 | |||
Short Caption: | CAROL A. MCELRATH V. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Unemployment Compensation |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 03/30/1989 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/30/1989 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 04/18/1989 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 10/26/1989 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 02/26/1990 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 07/23/1990 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | Carol A. Mcelrath | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | D.C. Department of Employment Services | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | MCELRATH, CAROL A. D.C. DEPARTMENT OF EMPLOYMENT SERVICES | |||
03/30/1989 | PETITIONER'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/30/1989 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/30/1989 | PETITION FOR REVIEW JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/31/1989 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/18/1989 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
04/18/1989 | ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/18/1989 | RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD R | |||
06/07/1989 | ORDER PTNR TO FL BRF IN 20 DAYS OR CASE DISMISSED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 052989 SCHPRD BA | |||
06/27/1989 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 062789 SCHPRD BA | |||
07/26/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-1-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD BE | |||
08/14/1989 | ORDER GRT RESPONDENTS MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME TO FILE THE BRIEF TO 9/1/89. PB PANEL SCDATE 081089 SCHPRD V | |||
09/01/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-05-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 090189 SCHPRD BE | |||
09/15/1989 | ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/5/89; NFX. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 091389 SCHPRD OPA | |||
10/05/1989 | RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 17, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 100589 SCHPRD BE | |||
10/17/1989 | RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/26/1989 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/26/1989 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/26/1989 | ORDER GRANTG RESP'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF; CLK TO FILE LODGED BRF; SCHED ON CAL ASAP. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD OPA | |||
02/22/1990 | STATEMENT OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: INTERIM & FINAL DECISION IN THE CASE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/23/1990 | RESPONDENT'S REPLY TO NOTICE OF FILING AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/26/1990 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
02/26/1990 | SUBMITTED PANELBESCFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/07/1990 | MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING 2/22 STATE & 2/23 RESPONSE TO DIVISION. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
03/14/1990 | AFFIRMED MOJ AF DECISION ON REVIEW PANELBESCFA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/14/1990 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
03/28/1990 | AFFIRMED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
04/30/1990 | ORDER THAT RESPONDENT W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH EN BANC (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
05/21/1990 | RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION IN RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 052190 SCHPRD ANSE | |||
07/23/1990 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |