judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SIGLER VS. SIGLER (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 47862
Short Caption:SIGLER VS. SIGLER (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41156
Lower Court Case(s):Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 01DI0521Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/2006 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/2006Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Peter B. Jaquette - check no. 11282.
08/16/2006Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 06-17139
08/24/2006Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/29/2006Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. 06-17950
08/31/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge Worrell. 06-18137
10/05/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. 06-20470
11/27/2006Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued. Appellant's counsel informed the Settlement Judge that he will withdraw the appeal. 06-24144
12/19/2006Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Appellant's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 06-25845
12/29/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to the motion for voluntary dismissal filed on December 19, 2006, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 06-26692
12/29/2006Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.